Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Decree | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof / Affidavit of Publication | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets Information | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Request - Original |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.