Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jones Rebecca Leigh, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Marquez, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2014 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time19 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Ex Parte Application for Emergency Order | |
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Response |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.