Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.