Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cypress Insurance Company, Martino, Michael Anthony, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mccarthy, Daniel B, Thomas, Diana L, against Airo, John W, Airo, Lisa Ann, represented by Britt, Lauren E, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.