Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lynch, Qiara, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ontiveros, Anthony M, against Miller, Frankie, represented by Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2020 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial461 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Posted | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Posted | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.