Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hall, David, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kopp, Jack E, against Davis, Ameleona, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2020 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.