Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Casto, Delmer E, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Gimblin, Steve, against Adventist Health & Rideout, Kaur, Mangandeep, Md, Sharma, Manish, Virdi, Baljindar K, Md, represented by Pollara Law Group, Schuering Zimmerman & Doyle Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateMay 01, 2020 |
Category(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedMay 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.