Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brewer, Nancy, Potts, Larry, Potts, Robert, Potts-Tordy, Marilyn, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Meyer, Greg A, against Melon Holdings Llc, represented by Wison Getty Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2017 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time396 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.