Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conway, Devon, Conway, Jenissa, Conway, Patricia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Demas Law Group, against Thao, Phew, State Of California Department Of Transportation, represented by Jacobs, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.