Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valerio, George, Valerio, Lori, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora, against Sullivan, Frank Lee, represented by Rushford & Bonotto, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2006 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time467 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Long Cause
Judge: Jury, Trial |
|
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Refund | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Check Trust Mailed to Defendant | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Request for Refund | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Letter Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.