Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zuber, Jacklyn Jassina, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time39 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Denied | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Report from CPS | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets Information | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Record Check to Sheriff's | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Referred to CPS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.