Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County Public Guardian Conservator, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2010 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time1280 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Accounting Report | |
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Hearing on Annual Review | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.