Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carter, Susan Louise filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2004 |
CategoryOther Probate With At Least One Hearing |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions26 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Case Cycle Time357 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event | PR Order Final Discharge | |
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event | PR Order Final Discharge | |
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 26, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Creditor's Claim | |
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
PR - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.