Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Winn Law Group, against Vandoren, Dianna, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Time To Trial541 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1687 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.