Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wolpoff & Abramson, against Lange, Frank, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions157 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time157 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Not Satisfied | |
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.