Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Standard Fire Ins, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Elie & Associates, against Martinez, Jose, Cubias, Rosa Eugenia, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
Category(22) Limited Auto - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions353 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time414 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Statement Sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.