Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Notestine, Evelyn M, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2004 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Return on Attachment/Execution | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Not Satisfied | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.