Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 1994 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Application and Order | |
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
October 09, 2000 | Docket Event | File at Annex | |
March 16, 2000 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
July 29, 1997 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
May 14, 1997 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 14, 1997 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
May 13, 1997 | Docket Event | Affidavit of |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.