Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Ridgway, Joseph Price, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 1994 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
August 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support | |
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS | |
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | FL Settlement Conference | |
October 09, 2000 | Docket Event | File at Annex |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.