Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Solano County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Jones, Kenneth J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time1039 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Change Responsibility Managing Support | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Change Responsibility Managing Support | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.