Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Buford, Petree Valentino, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Buford, Kali, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time219 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Ruling | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Continued Order To Show Cause | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Mediation Orientation
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.