Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ubias, Lorenzo L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ubias, Consuelo M, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.