Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nabeta, Kameron, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nabeta, Tennasity, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time263 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Property Declaration | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.