Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Blacksher, Sylvia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Blacksher, Darius, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Wirtschafter, Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWirtschafter, Benjamin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Governmental - Stipulation and Order | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Stipulation and Order | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support Order | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Statement Registration CA (Existing Case) | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Governmental - Ntc Registration CA Support Order (Outgoing) | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.