Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pantaleoni, Virginia Collier, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pantaleoni, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kathleen R. O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen R. O'Connor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management38 days |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | FL Status/Case Management Conference | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration RE Service of Disclosure Respondents I&E | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | FL Status/Case Management Conference | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.