Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jayawardene, Jennifer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jayawardene, Bernard, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management47 days |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial295 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time320 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Transfer | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.