Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estes, Nora Lyn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Estes, Terrence William, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Conversion Error, . presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion Error, . Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management383 days |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial392 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions602 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time602 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
OSC For Failure To Appear
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.