Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Callaway, Sandra, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Callaway, David, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management322 days |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions668 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time668 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Receipt for Exhibits | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Receipt for Exhibits | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.