Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Navarro-Zunick, Sean A, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Fenton, Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kathleen R. O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen R. O'Connor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2014 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time24 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.