Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramirez, Sandra, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cedano, Joaquin, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management159 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2005 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions159 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time1439 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.