Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
United Rentals Northwest Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Diepnbrock & Harrison, against Bunfill, Harry, California Partners, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time926 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.