Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maan, Tejinder S, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Vega, Connie, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Time To Trial54 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time69 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Subservice | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Small Claims Continued at Plaintiff's Request | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.