Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time862 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment SC | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Ruling | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Request | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.