Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Davies, Crystal, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Eisner, Alexander C, against Forge Building Co., Inc., Melgoza, Jose, represented by Livingston, Renee W, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: November 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFTS FORGE BUILDING COMPANY LLC AND JOSE MELGOZA |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DEFTS | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice PLAINTIFF CRYSTAL DAVIES NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER OF FORGE BUILDING COMPANY LLC AND JOSE MELGOZA |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED FORGE BUILING CO INC, KAITLYN MANNIX, WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ON 8/19/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.