Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bartlett, Cynthia Marie, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Falconer, Brandon Ray Scott, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED BRANDON RAY SCOTT FALCONER WITH CH-109, CH-110, CH-100 AND CH-120 ON 4/12/2021 |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment TRO | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Order | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE CORTES FOR REVIEW OF CHRO |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE CORTES |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.