Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barua, Dibakar, Barua, Jenifer, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wolk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wolk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryName Change |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: April 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Law and Motion Minute Order *Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition NAME CHANGE Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Lodged Document DECREE CHANGING NAME |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause NAME CHANCE |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Decree of Change of Name/Gender | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE WOLK |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.