Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Thayer, Joseph, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lim, Jeeho H, against Fca Us Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Hoblit Chrysler Jeep Dodge, A California Corporation, represented by Universal, Jon D, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: May 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice DEFENDANT'S FCA US LLC AND HOBLIT CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFTS FCA US LLC AND HOBLIT CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited DEFTS FCA US LLC AND HOBLIT CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service- SERVED FCA US, LLC; AGENT FOR SERVICE CARLOS PAZ, SERVED SUMMONS AND CMPLT ON 1/5/2021 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents PROOF OF SERVICE : FAILURE TO E-FILE |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED HOBLIT CRYSTLER JEEP DODGE, DAVID WAYNE HOBLIT, WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1-6-2021 |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE MCADAM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.