Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Frye, Steve, filed a(n) 08: Unlimited Civil Rights case represented by Williams, Daniel J, against Us Cryotherapy Direct Sales, Llc., Us Cryotherapy Franchising, Llc., Individually And Dba Us Cryotherapy, represented by Haynes, Derek J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
Category08: Unlimited Civil Rights |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
*Case Management Conference
Date: April 26, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: July 26, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: October 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court 8 DAYS Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED DEREK J HAYNES WITH CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON 10/11/2021 |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFTS |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited DEFT'S ANSWER TO PLTFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED US CRYOTHERAPY FRANCHISING LLC WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 4/22/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.