Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of The West, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scheidt, Bruce A, against Barison, Diego, Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive, Gattopardo Usa, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGMENT SENT TO JUDGE WOLK |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Received BY GABRIEL P. HERRERA |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECALRATION OF GABRIEL P. HERERA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed BRIEF SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | *Request to Enter Default | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received JUDGEMENT |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECALRATION OF DAVID REID IN SUPOPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTRY OF RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AFTER HEARING |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.