Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniel Abarca Hernandez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gonsalves, Anthony Crippen, Esq., against Clyde Lamar, Tanner Delbert Thorson, Tric Machine Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandhu, Sonny S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury case involving property damage and wrongful death. The plaintiff, Daniel Abarca Hernandez, is suing the defendants Tanner Delbert Thorson, Clyde Lamar, Tri-C Machine Corporation, and Does 1-50. The case number is C...
Summons on Amended Complaint
Date: March 01, 2021Summons on Amended Complaint
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 26, 2021Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
Date: May 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2021Order
Date: May 19, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: February 26, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: March 01, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 28, 2021Proof of Service of Summons
Date: March 30, 2021Complaint
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: April 06, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: March 01, 2021Complaint
Date: February 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons on Amended Complaint FIRST Summons on Amended Complaint |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Amended Complaint | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.