Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Villanueva, Juan, against Letelier, Eduardo A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management390 days |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Motion
Date: December 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Motion
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition - No Fee DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED; DECLARATION OF EDUARDO LETELIER IN SUPPORT THEREOF |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY MAIL; SERVED BRIAN WINN W/ DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED; DECLARATION OF EDUARDO LETELIER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; ON 11/23/2020 |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of submission on plaintiff's motion to deem facts as admitted | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Lodging of Documents | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - $60 Fee Motion to deem facts as admitted |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10,000 | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) FOR EDUARDO LETELIER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.