Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barry, Camilla filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time23 days |
*Order to Show Cause
Date: July 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
718 OSC* *Order to Show Cause Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: DANIEL (DANE) DEVOIL WITH ATTACHMENTS, REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP CIVIL HARASSMENT, ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP CIVIL HARASSMENT, NOTICE OF HEARING AND TRO (CLETS), ADDITIONAL PAGE MC-020 ON 7-15-2020 |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment TRO TEMP RESTRAINING ORD Notes: EXPIRES 7-23-2020 AT 9:00 AM |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES PT20-887 | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE CORTES FOR REVIEW ON TRO |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE MCADAM |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet OTHER PETITION |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN* Notes: REQ FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.