Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fisher, Ursula, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobson, Kevin Y, against Fca Us, Llc, Michael C. Stead, Inc., represented by Universal, Jon D, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateJune 26, 2020 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denied DENIED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To STIP AND ORDER SENT TO JUDGE WOLK |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Fees Posted FILED BY DEFTS FCA US LLC AND MICHAEL C STEAD |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFTS FCA US LLC AND MICHAEL C STEAD |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLTFF |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: FCA US LLC WITH AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST SHEET ON 7/22/2020 |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint AMEND COMPLAINT Notes: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SUBSERVED: MICHAEL C. STEAD, INC. WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 7/6/2020 AND MAILED ON 7/13/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.