Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lawson, James R, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hahn, Roger, against American Contracto, Rs Indemnity Company, Financial Pacific, Insurance Co, Vanderpool, Doug, represented by Davidovitz & Bennett, Llp, Stroj, Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with White, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhite, Kathleen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateApril 14, 2006 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial662 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time850 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: THAT SUPERIOR COURT HAS ASSUMED JURIS OVER LAW PRACTICE OF GARY R MATTA (B&PC 6180 ET SEQ) | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER FROM THE STATE BAR OF CA | |
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal DISM OF X-COMPL Notes: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY CO ON 9/29/06 |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
General Close CLOSE CASE Notes: COMPLAINT DISMISSED ON 5/24/07 CROSS COMPLAINT BY VANDERPOOL DISMISSED ON 1/18/08 CROSS COMPLAINT BY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS IDEMNITY COMPANY DISMISSED ON 8/11/08. NOW THAT ALL ACTIONS HAVE BEEN DISMISSED CASE IS CLOSED |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF SETTLEMENT BY CROSS COMPLAINANT AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY (ACIC) AND CROSS-DEFTS BC CONSTRUCTION, BOBBY CASTILLO, THOMAS BAROODY FILED BY X-DEFT/X-COMPL AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY CO. | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF NO APPEARANCES. CLERK CALLED COUNSEL, WHO ADVISED THAT CASE HAS SETTL ED. J.T. VACATED. Judge: White, Kathleen M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.