Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Naveed, Rabina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Faris, James, Picking, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management278 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
Category22: Limited Auto - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions674 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time792 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Arbitration - Status Conference ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
December 06, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION* Notes: TO ARBITRATE | |
November 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JAMES FARIS |
|
November 04, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AS REQUESTED | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF P DONOGHUE FOR PLTF BY C.C. M HARRIS FOR DEF BY C.C. NOTICE OF HRG WAS GIVEN TO NEW PARTY. CONTINUED TO/FOR: ARB SETTING CONF 12-12-05 9:00 DEPT. 2. PERSONAL APPEARANCE REQUIRED. IF COU STIP TO AN ARBITRATOR-COU CAN SUBMIT A JOINT REQUEST TO DROP HRG. NOTICE OF HRG DATE TO BE ISSUED. Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; CROSS-COMPL ON JAMES FARIS BY LEAVING WITH PAT FARIS AND MAILING ON AUG22, 2005 |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MAIN SHELF |
|
September 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF DEFT & X-COMPLAINANT MELISSA PICKING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.