Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Platt Electric, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pietraczyk, Edmond R, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2001 |
Category26: Limited Other Real Property - 10,000 -25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2218 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment ORD OSC-DISM FST TRK Notes: FILED |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MTN DISM LACK PROSEC NO APPEARANCE MOTION GRANTED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
February 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
February 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed DISM PARTY Notes: FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION OF AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FORE- CLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN, AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS. |
|
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE SECOND, THIRD AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF AMENDED COMPLAINT, AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS ENTERED AS REQUESTED |
|
July 24, 2001 | Docket Event | STIPULATION* Notes: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT | |
June 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed DISM PARTY Notes: AMENDED COMPLAINT, AS TO DEFENDANT AMWEST SURETY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION, ONLY |
|
June 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: TRIAMID INC BY SERVING ANGELIQUE COOK, ADMIN.ASST ON 4/11/01 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.