Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Nine Islands I Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Robb, M Jonathan, Esq., against Moxie Management Group Llc, Regis Corporation, Supercuts Corporate Shops Inc, Supercuts Inc, represented by Boyd, Joseph, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Opposition to Motion
Date: February 16, 2021Answer/General Denial
Date: November 16, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: April 20, 2021Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: August 19, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 16, 2020Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Application and Hearing
Date: March 12, 2021Reply to Opposition
Date: April 22, 2021Request for Entry of Default - Not Entered
Date: November 16, 2020Reply to Opposition
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 04, 2021Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: March 12, 2021Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
Date: October 13, 2020Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 09, 2021Supplemental Declaration
Date: February 19, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 20, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 14, 2021Declaration
Date: January 22, 2021Proof of Service
Date: February 19, 2021Declaration
Date: April 20, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 08, 2021Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
Date: October 13, 2020Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service
Date: October 22, 2020Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: January 22, 2021Declaration
Date: January 22, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 12, 2021Objection
Date: February 22, 2021Declaration
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Application and Hearing
Date: January 22, 2021Amended Declaration
Date: April 08, 2021Opposition
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Application and Hearing
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: August 24, 2021Request for Entry of Default - Not Entered
Date: November 16, 2020Notice of Application and Hearing
Date: March 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Application and Hearing
Date: January 22, 2021Declaration
Date: February 16, 2021Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: January 22, 2021Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: March 12, 2021Under Submission
Date: April 27, 2021Request for Entry of Default - Not Entered
Date: November 16, 2020Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 14, 2021Proof of Service - Mail
Date: February 22, 2021Proposed Order
Date: January 22, 2021Proof of Service
Date: January 22, 2021Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: January 22, 2021Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
Date: October 13, 2020Proof of Service
Date: February 16, 2021Complaint
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Notice
Date: April 08, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: September 29, 2020Notice
Date: January 22, 2021Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Application and Hearing
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: September 18, 2020Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: January 22, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 22, 2021Opposition to Motion
Date: February 16, 2021Objection
Date: February 22, 2021Reply to Opposition
Date: February 19, 2021Answer/General Denial
Date: November 16, 2020Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: March 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 12, 2021Opposition
Date: April 20, 2021Writ of Attachment/Possession Hearing
Date: February 23, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 26, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 19, 2021Declaration
Date: April 20, 2021Amended Declaration
Date: April 08, 2021Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Supplemental Declaration
Date: February 19, 2021Complaint
Date: September 18, 2020Writ of Attachment/Possession Hearing
Date: April 27, 2021Reply to Opposition
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Under Submission
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
April 27, 2021 | Hearing | Writ of Attachment/Possession Hearing | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Application and Hearing SUPERCUTS, INC. Writ of Attachment/Possession Hearing Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Case Management Conference | ||
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.