Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Personnel Board Of filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 1998 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCE Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED* | |
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-V-98000219(V5) | |
July 02, 1998 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER $ S Notes: TO PETITIONFOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.