Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
25 Essex L.P., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Brewer, Justin, against Brooks, Rebekah, Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time88 days |
This complaint is a summons issued in a case between 25 Essex L.P. and Rebekah Brooks et al. The plaintiff, 5 Essex L.P., is suing the defendant, Rebekah Brooks, and Does 1 to 10 inclusive, for unlawful detainer-eviction. The defendant is being notif...
DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P.
Date: March 25, 2016DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE 10-DAY NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P.
Date: March 25, 2016NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: February 25, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P.
Date: March 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT BROOKS, REBEKAH | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT BROOKS, REBEKAH | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P. SERVED MAR-17-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BROOKS, REBEKAH | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BROOKS, REBEKAH THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 25 ESSEX STREET #815, SAN FRANCISCO, SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, CA 94105, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P. AS TO DEFENDANT BROOKS, REBEKAH | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P. | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE 10-DAY NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P. | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT BROOKS, REBEKAH | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.33 FILED BY PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P. | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 25 ESSEX L.P. AS TO DEFENDANT BROOKS, REBEKAH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.