Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Canales, Zoila Angelica, filed a(n) Money case against Aleman, Elsy, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald S. Mitchell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2011 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time373 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | THE ORDER OF EXAMINATION IS DISCHARGED AS TO DEFENDANT, THE JUDGMENT IS SATISFIED ON 12/12/12. NO APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: JEAN MILEFF. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
December 13, 2012 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF EXAMINATION CALENDAR
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT ALEMAN, ELSY D.B.A. TRANSPORTES SALVADORENO SUCHITLAN | |
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS OEX CALENDAR OF SEP-27-2012 IS CONTINUED STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES FOR PROGESS REPORT TO DEC-13-2012 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 506. "JUDGMENT CREDITOR IS GOING TO DELIVER THE BOX IN EL SALVADOR BY NOVEMBER 30, 2012. JUDGMENT CREDITOR WILL FILE A SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT UPON DELIVERY OF THE BOX", PER JUDGE MITCHELL. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
September 27, 2012 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF EXAMINATION CALENDAR
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALEMAN, ELSY D.B.A. TRANSPORTES SALVADORENO SUCHITLAN | |
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS OEX CALENDAR OF SEP-10-2012 IS CONTINUED TO SEP-27-2012 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 506 BENCH LETTER ISSUED. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
September 10, 2012 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF EXAMINATION CALENDAR
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION & ORDER TO PRODUCE STATEMENT OF ASSETTS TO DEFENDANT ELSY ALEMAN. | |
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED AS TO DEFENDANT ALEMAN, ELSY D.B.A. TRANSPORTES SALVADORENO SUCHITLAN HEARING SET FOR SEP-10-2012 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.